Senate | 05/29/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 645 | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Senate Concurs House Amendments | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Third Reading Passed (95-42) | ||
House | 04/06/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {683628/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/06/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | Hearing 3/29 at 2:45 p.m. | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 03/19/2022 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Referred Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {813229/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 01/21/2022 | Hearing 1/25 at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/17/2022 | Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/14/2022 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |