House | 02/22/2022 | Referred Economic Matters | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {913823/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/14/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 01/21/2022 | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2022 | First Reading Finance |