House | 03/16/2022 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | Referred Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/24/2022 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/21/2022 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 01/20/2022 | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2022 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |