Senate | 05/16/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 431 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 02/22/2022 | Referred Environment and Transportation | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {633223/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 01/20/2022 | Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2022 | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |