Senate | 04/12/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 97 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Third Reading Passed (135-0) | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Referred Environment and Transportation | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {513128/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 01/14/2022 | Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 10/07/2021 | Pre-filed |