Senate
|
05/12/2022
|
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 341
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Passed Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Senate Concurs House Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2022
|
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (133-0)
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2022
|
Floor Amendment {713329/1 (Delegate Pippy) Rejected (39-93)
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2022
|
Floor Amendment {203124/1 (Delegate Stein) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Motion Special Order until 4/9 (Delegate Stein) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Floor Amendment {153127/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (43-93)
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments {653222/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Referred Environment and Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
Floor Amendment {393724/1 (Senator Edwards) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Kagan) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Edwards) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Motion Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Edwards) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments {813921/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
|
|
|