House | 03/18/2022 | Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | Referred Health and Government Operations | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {653326/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 01/25/2022 | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) | ||
Senate | 01/21/2022 | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance |