House | 03/11/2022 | Referred Environment and Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Floor Amendment {253528/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (15-31) | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {893727/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {893727/1 | ||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2022 | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |