Senate | 04/12/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 111 | ||
Senate | 04/01/2022 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/01/2022 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 04/01/2022 | Senate Concurs House Amendments | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Third Reading Passed (101-31) | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {853622/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/11/2022 | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/11/2022 | Referred Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {723521/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Motion Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {723521/1 | ||
Senate | 03/04/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | Hearing 2/08 at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2022 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |