Senate | 04/21/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 187 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Senate Concurs House Amendments | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (133-0) | ||
House | 04/09/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {103520/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/09/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 04/09/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 02/23/2022 | Referred Environment and Transportation | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {833227/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2022 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |