House | 03/21/2022 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Referred Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {603421/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2022 | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |