House | 04/06/2022 | Motion Special Order until 4/11 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted | ||
House | 04/06/2022 | Floor Amendment {253521/1 (Delegate Mautz) | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Referred Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {223624/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Hearing 2/24 at 8:30 a.m. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | Hearing 2/24 at 9:00 a.m. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |