Senate | 04/21/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 182 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Third Reading Passed (120-15) | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Referred Environment and Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Floor Amendment {733925/1 (Senator West) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Motion Special Order until 3/21 (Senator Smith) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/04/2022 | Motion Special Order until 3/7 (Senator Jennings) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 01/05/2022 | Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 10/15/2021 | Pre-filed |