Maryland 2022 2022 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB44 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 03/21/2022

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *sb0044*  
  
SENATE BILL 44 
E1   	2lr0784 
SB 122/21 – JPR 	(PRE–FILED) 	CF HB 16 
By: Senators West, Jackson, Kramer, and Sydnor 
Requested: October 15, 2021 
Introduced and read first time: January 12, 2022 
Assigned to: Judicial Proceedings 
Committee Report: Favorable 
Senate action: Adopted with floor amendments 
Read second time: March 8, 2022 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Crimes – Unattended Dogs – Extreme Weather Conditions and Heat 2 
 
FOR the purpose of prohibiting a person from leaving a dog outside and unattended for 3 
longer than a certain period without access to certain suitable shelter or suitable 4 
shade during certain weather conditions or temperatures, subject to certain 5 
exceptions; and generally relating to leaving unattended dogs outside. 6 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 7 
 Article – Criminal Law 8 
Section 10–623 9 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 10 
 (2021 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 11 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 12 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 13 
 
Article – Criminal Law 14 
 
10–623. 15 
 
 (a) (1) In this section the following words have the meanings indicated. 16 
 
 (2) “Collar” means a device constructed of nylon, leather, or similar 17 
material specifically designed to be used around the neck of a dog. 18  2 	SENATE BILL 44  
 
 
 
 (3) (I) “EXTREME WEATHER CONDI	TIONS” MEANS 1 
TEMPERATURES BELOW 32 DEGREES FAHRENHEIT OR CONDITI ONS DURING AN 2 
ACTIVE WINTER OR COLD WEATHER WARNING OR A DVISORY ISSUED BY THE 3 
NATIONAL WEATHER SERVICE. 4 
 
 (II) “EXTREME WEATHER CONDI TIONS” DOES NOT INCLUDE 5 
MARINE WARNINGS OR A DVISORIES ISSUED BY THE NATIONAL WEATHER SERVICE. 6 
 
 [(3)] (4) “Restraint” means a chain, rope, tether, leash, cable, or other 7 
device that attaches a dog to a stationary object or trolley system. 8 
 
 (5) “SPORTING” MEANS ANY ATHLETIC C OMPETITION, SKILL 9 
COMPETITION , OBEDIENCE COMPETITIO N, OR OTHER COMPETITION INTENDED FOR 10 
THE PARTICIPATION OF DOGS.  11 
 
 (6) “SUITABLE SHADE ” MEANS AN AREA COMPLETELY PROTECTED 12 
FROM THE DIRECT SUN THAT IS ACCESSIBLE A ND FULLY COVERS A DO G. 13 
 
 (7) (I) “SUITABLE SHELTER ” MEANS A STRUCTURE TH AT: 14 
 
 1. (I) IS PROPERLY VENTILAT ED; 15 
 
 2. (II) HAS A SOLID FLOOR TH AT IS RAISED OFF THE GR OUND 16 
OR A SOLID FLOOR THA T IS PROPERLY INSULATE D ALLOWS THE DOG TO RE MAIN 17 
REASONABLY DRY ; 18 
 
 3. (III) HAS A WEATHERPROOF R OOF; 19 
 
 4. (IV) HAS FOUR WALLS , ONE OF WHICH CONTAIN S A 20 
DOORWAY IS ENCLOSED WITH AN ENTRANCE ON ONE SIDE ; 21 
 
 5. (V) HAS INSULATION TO AL LOW ALLOWS A DOG TO 22 
MAINTAIN ITS NORMAL BODY TEMPERATURE ; AND 23 
 
 6. (VI) IS SUITABLE FOR THE 	SPECIES, AGE, 24 
CONDITION, SIZE, AND TYPE OF DOG . 25 
 
 (II) “SUITABLE SHELTER ” DOES NOT INCLUDE : 26 
 
 1. A CRAWL SPACE THAT I S UNDER A BUILDING O R PART 27 
OF A BUILDING; 28 
 
 2. THE SPACE UNDER A VEHICL E; 29 
   	SENATE BILL 44 	3 
 
 
 3. A FLOOR CONSISTING O F WIRE OR CHAIN LINK ; OR 1 
 
 4. A STRUCTURE MADE FRO M CARDBOARD OR OTHER 2 
MATERIALS THAT ARE E ASILY DEGRADED BY TH E ELEMENTS. 3 
 
 (b) A person may not leave a dog outside and unattended by use of a restraint: 4 
 
 (1) that unreasonably limits the movement of the dog; 5 
 
 (2) that uses a collar that: 6 
 
 (i) is made primarily of metal; or 7 
 
 (ii) is not at least as large as the circumference of the dog’s neck plus 8 
1 inch; 9 
 
 (3) that restricts the access of the dog to suitable and sufficient clean water 10 
or appropriate shelter; 11 
 
 (4) in unsafe or unsanitary conditions; or 12 
 
 (5) that causes injury to the dog. 13 
 
 (C) EXCEPT AS PROVIDED IN SUBSECTION (D) OF THIS SECTION, A PERSON 14 
MAY NOT LEAVE A DOG OUTSIDE AND UNATTEND ED FOR LONGER THAN 30 MINUTES 15 
WITHOUT ACCESS TO CO NTINUOUS:  16 
 
 (1) SUITABLE SHELTER DUR ING EXTREME WEATHER CONDITIONS; 17 
AND 18 
 
 (2) SUITABLE SHELTER OR SUITABLE SHADE WHEN TEMPERATURES 19 
ARE ABOVE 90 DEGREES FAHRENHEIT BUT BELOW WHAT IS RE QUIRED FOR A HEAT 20 
ADVISORY. 21 
 
 (D) THE PROHIBITION IN SU BSECTION (C) OF THIS SECTION DOES NOT 22 
APPLY IF THE DOG IS LAWFULLY AND ACTIVEL Y ENGAGED IN: 23 
 
 (1) HUNTING;  24 
 
 (2) LIVESTOCK HERDING OR GUARDING;  25 
 
 (3) SLEDDING; 26 
 
 (4) SPORTING; OR 27 
  4 	SENATE BILL 44  
 
 
 (5) TRAINING.  1 
 
 [(c)] (E) (1) A person who violates SUBSECTION (B) OF this section is guilty 2 
of a misdemeanor and on conviction is subject to imprisonment not exceeding 90 days or a 3 
fine not exceeding $1,000 or both. 4 
 
 (2) A VIOLATION OF SUBSECT ION (C) OF THIS SECTION IS A CIVIL 5 
OFFENSE PUNISHABLE B Y: 6 
 
 (I) FOR A FIRST VIOLATIO N, A WARNING; 7 
 
 (II) FOR A SECOND VIOLATI ON, A CIVIL PENALTY OF U P TO $500; 8 
AND 9 
 
 (III) FOR A THIRD OR SUBSE QUENT VIOLATION , A CIVIL PENALTY 10 
OF UP TO $1,000.  11 
 
 (F) THIS SECTION MAY NOT BE CONSTRUED TO PROH IBIT A LOCAL 12 
GOVERNMENT FROM ADOP TING A REQUIREMENT F OR THE HEALTH AND SA FETY OF 13 
DOGS THAT IS MORE ST RINGENT THAN THE REQ UIREMENTS OF THIS SECTION.  14 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 15 
October 1, 2022.  16 
 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates.