House | 04/07/2022 | Hearing 4/07 at 12:00 p.m. | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations | ||
Senate | 03/28/2022 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | ||
Senate | 03/25/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/25/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {543322/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/25/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2022 | First Reading Finance |