Senate | 05/29/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 528 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | House Recede | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (88-0) | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Motion Recede (Delegate Pendergrass) Adopted | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Senate Requests House Recede | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Third Reading Passed (134-0) | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {573629/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Hearing 3/22 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 03/11/2022 | Referred Health and Government Operations | ||
Senate | 03/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 03/09/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/09/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Motion Special Order until 3/9 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 01/27/2022 | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2022 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |