House | 03/29/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Referred Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Third Reading Passed (32-14) | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Floor Committee Amendment {693225/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 01/27/2022 | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2022 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |