Senate | 05/16/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 481 | ||
Senate | 04/01/2022 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/01/2022 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 04/01/2022 | Senate Concurs House Amendments | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Third Reading Passed (125-9) | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {803129/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/25/2022 | Referred Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 02/24/2022 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {633528/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/21/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 01/27/2022 | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2022 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |