Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 207
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Returned Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (129-2)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Rereferred to Ways and Means and Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments {243121/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) and Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) and Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
|
|
|