Senate | 04/01/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 14 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Third Reading Passed (132-0) | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | Rereferred to Ways and Means | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Third Reading Passed (41-0) | ||
Senate | 03/28/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/28/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {113428/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/28/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Hearing 2/15 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
Senate | 01/27/2022 | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2022 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |