Senate | 05/29/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 498 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Smith) Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Senate Concurs House Amendments | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (134-1) | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Floor Amendment {783424/1 (Delegate Cox) Rejected (40-94) | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
House | 04/09/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 04/09/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {683624/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Referred Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 02/03/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
Senate | 02/03/2022 | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2022 | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |