Senate | 05/29/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 620 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (130-0) | ||
House | 04/09/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/09/2022 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 03/11/2022 | Referred Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/04/2022 | Motion Special Order until 3/7 (Senator Smith) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/04/2022 | Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 01/31/2022 | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2022 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |