Senate | 05/29/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 579 | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Senate Concurs House Amendments | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Third Reading Passed (109-26) | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Floor Amendment {693524/1 (Delegate D. Jones) Adopted | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | Referred Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 03/04/2022 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/01/2022 | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 02/03/2022 | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2022 | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |