House | 04/07/2022 | Hearing 4/07 at 12:00 p.m. | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 04/01/2022 | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations | ||
Senate | 04/01/2022 | Third Reading Passed (30-15) | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {593321/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Motion Laid Over (Senator Salling) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {593321/1 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 02/03/2022 | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2022 | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |