Senate | 05/27/2022 | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/04/2022 | Third Reading Passed (85-39) | ||
House | 04/01/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/01/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 04/01/2022 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Referred Health and Government Operations | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Third Reading Passed (39-8) | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Floor Amendment {913424/1 (Senator Lam) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {443620/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Lam) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {443620/1 | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Cassilly) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/04/2022 | Reassigned to Finance | ||
Senate | 01/31/2022 | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |