Senate | 05/29/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 631 | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | ||
House | 04/06/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/06/2022 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 03/16/2022 | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Referred Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/04/2022 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {973621/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 02/03/2022 | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2022 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |