House | 03/29/2022 | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Referred Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {533021/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 02/03/2022 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |