Senate | 05/16/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 463 | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Third Reading Passed (98-40) | ||
House | 04/06/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/06/2022 | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Referred Environment and Transportation Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/04/2022 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/01/2022 | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 01/27/2022 | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 11/01/2021 | Pre-filed |