Senate | 05/16/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 395 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Third Reading Passed (126-0) | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Hearing 3/22 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | Referred Health and Government Operations | ||
Senate | 03/04/2022 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {993422/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/01/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 02/03/2022 | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2022 | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |