House | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (129-4) | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {983527/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Referred Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {563825/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2022 | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |