House | 03/19/2022 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Referred Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 02/05/2022 | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2022 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |