Senate | 04/21/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 179 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/04/2022 | Third Reading Passed (102-24) | ||
House | 04/01/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 02/22/2022 | Referred Environment and Transportation | ||
Senate | 02/21/2022 | Third Reading Passed (32-14) | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Floor Amendment {843821/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (18-29) | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {253825/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {253825/1 | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 01/14/2022 | Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 10/05/2021 | Pre-filed |