House | 04/11/2022 | Rereferred to Economic Matters and Appropriations | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {773725/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 02/05/2022 | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/04/2022 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |