Senate | 05/16/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 462 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Senate Concurs House Amendments | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {683429/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Referred Economic Matters Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {563225/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/04/2022 | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |