Senate | 05/29/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 635 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (129-1) | ||
House | 04/09/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Rereferred to Ways and Means | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |