House | 04/11/2022 | Rereferred to Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Floor Amendment {243429/1 (Senator Washington) Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Washington) Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {603920/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |