House | 03/15/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Referred Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {723220/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 01/13/2022 | Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/13/2022 | Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 08/05/2021 | Pre-filed |