Senate
|
05/12/2022
|
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 337
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Passed Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Senate Concurs House Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (134-3)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments {693028/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Referred Environment and Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
Floor Amendment {683428/1 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments {393924/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Hearing canceled
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
|
|
|