House | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Failed (57-65) | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Motion Special Order until 4/11 (Delegate Washington) Adopted (92-44) | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Referred Environment and Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Third Reading Passed (41-3) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {463524/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/11/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |