Maryland 2022 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB752 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11
22
33 EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW.
44 [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law.
55 *sb0752*
66
77 SENATE BILL 752
88 E4 2lr2891
99 CF 2lr3090
1010 By: Senator Jackson
1111 Introduced and read first time: February 7, 2022
1212 Assigned to: Judicial Proceedings
1313
1414 A BILL ENTITLED
1515
1616 AN ACT concerning 1
1717
1818 Public Safety – Use of Force Incident Reports 2
1919
2020 FOR the purpose of altering a reporting requirement applicable to a law enforcement officer 3
2121 or police officer involved in a use of force incident in the line of duty; requiring a local 4
2222 law enforcement agency to publish certain information on its public website; and 5
2323 generally relating to use of force incident reports. 6
2424
2525 BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 7
2626 Article – Public Safety 8
2727 Section 3–514 9
2828 Annotated Code of Maryland 10
2929 (2018 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 11
3030
3131 BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 12
3232 Article – Public Safety 13
3333 Section 3–514 14
3434 Annotated Code of Maryland 15
3535 (2018 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 16
3636 (As enacted by Chapter 59 of the Acts of the General Assembly of 2021) 17
3737
3838 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 18
3939 That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 19
4040
4141 Article – Public Safety 20
4242
4343 3–514. 21
4444
4545 (A) (1) Each law enforcement agency shall require a law enforcement officer 22
4646 who was involved in a use of force incident in the line of duty to file an incident report 23
4747 regarding the use of force by the end of the officer’s shift unless the officer is disabled. 24 2 SENATE BILL 752
4848
4949
5050
5151 (2) THE INCIDENT REPORT S HALL INCLUDE : 1
5252
5353 (I) THE TYPE OF ENCOUNTE R; 2
5454
5555 (II) THE TYPE OF FORCE US ED; 3
5656
5757 (III) THE LOCATION AT WHIC H FORCE WAS USED ; 4
5858
5959 (IV) THE LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICER’S JUSTIFICATION FOR 5
6060 THE USE OF FORCE ; 6
6161
6262 (V) WHETHER THE INDIVIDU AL AGAINST WHOM FORC E WAS 7
6363 USED WAS ARRESTED ; 8
6464
6565 (VI) WHAT CHARGES THE INDIVIDUAL AGAINST W HOM FORCE 9
6666 WAS USED WAS ARRESTE D FOR, IF ANY; 10
6767
6868 (VII) WHETHER THE INDIVIDU AL AGAINST WHOM FORC E WAS 11
6969 USED REQUESTED MEDIC AL CARE; 12
7070
7171 (VIII) WHETHER THE LAW ENFO RCEMENT OFFICER REQU ESTED 13
7272 MEDICAL CARE ; AND 14
7373
7474 (IX) THE DEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION ABOUT AN Y LAW 15
7575 ENFORCEMENT OFFICER INVOLVED IN AND INDI VIDUALS SUBJECT TO T HE USE OF 16
7676 FORCE, INCLUDING: 17
7777
7878 1. RACE; 18
7979
8080 2. ETHNICITY; 19
8181
8282 3. GENDER; 20
8383
8484 4. AGE; AND 21
8585
8686 5. DISABILITY. 22
8787
8888 (B) (1) ON OR BEFORE JULY 1, 2024, AND ANNUALLY THEREA FTER, EACH 23
8989 LOCAL LAW ENFORCEMEN T AGENCY SHALL PUBLI SH ON ITS PUBLIC WEB SITE THE 24
9090 AGGREGATE DATA OF PO LICE OFFICERS ’ USE OF FORCE REPORTE D UNDER 25
9191 SUBSECTION (A) OF THIS SECTION. 26
9292 SENATE BILL 752 3
9393
9494
9595 (2) ON OR BEFORE JANUARY 1, 2023, AND EVERY 3 MONTHS 1
9696 THEREAFTER , EACH LOCAL LA W ENFORCEMENT AGENCY SHALL PUBLISH ON ITS 2
9797 PUBLIC WEBSITE THE T OTAL NUMBER OF USE O F FORCE INCIDENTS RE PORTED 3
9898 UNDER SUBSECTION (A) OF THIS SECTION FOR THE PRECEDING 3 MONTHS IN WHICH 4
9999 THE LOCAL LAW ENFORC EMENT AGENCY DETERMI NED THAT: 5
100100
101101 (I) THE USE OF FORCE WAS CONSISTENT WITH ITS POLICIES 6
102102 AND APPLICABLE LAWS ; AND 7
103103
104104 (II) THE USE OF FORCE WAS NOT CONSISTENT WITH ITS 8
105105 POLICIES AND APPLICA BLE LAWS. 9
106106
107107 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That the Laws of Maryland read 10
108108 as follows: 11
109109
110110 Article – Public Safety 12
111111
112112 3–514. 13
113113
114114 (a) (1) Each law enforcement agency shall require a police officer who was 14
115115 involved in a use of force incident in the line of duty to file an incident report regarding the 15
116116 use of force by the end of the officer’s shift unless the officer is disabled. 16
117117
118118 (2) THE INCIDENT REPORT S HALL INCLUDE : 17
119119
120120 (I) THE TYPE OF ENCOUNTE R; 18
121121
122122 (II) THE TYPE OF FORCE US ED; 19
123123
124124 (III) THE LOCATION AT WHIC H FORCE WAS USED ; 20
125125
126126 (IV) THE LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICER’S JUSTIFICATION FOR 21
127127 USE OF FORCE; 22
128128
129129 (V) WHETHER THE INDIVIDU AL AGAINST WHOM FORCE W AS 23
130130 USED WAS ARRESTED ; 24
131131
132132 (VI) WHAT CHARGES THE IND IVIDUAL AGAINST WHOM FORCE 25
133133 WAS USED WAS ARRESTE D FOR, IF ANY; 26
134134
135135 (VII) WHETHER THE INDIVIDU AL AGAINST WHOM FORC E WAS 27
136136 USED REQUESTED MEDIC AL CARE; 28
137137 4 SENATE BILL 752
138138
139139
140140 (VIII) WHETHER THE LAW ENFO RCEMENT OFFICER REQUESTED 1
141141 MEDICAL CARE ; AND 2
142142
143143 (IX) THE DEMOGRAPHIC INFO RMATION ABOUT ANY LA W 3
144144 ENFORCEMENT OFFICER INVOLVED IN AND INDI VIDUALS SUBJECT TO T HE USE OF 4
145145 FORCE, INCLUDING: 5
146146
147147 1. RACE 6
148148
149149 2. ETHNICITY; 7
150150
151151 3. GENDER; 8
152152
153153 4. AGE; AND 9
154154
155155 5. DISABILITY. 10
156156
157157 (b) (1) ON OR BEFORE JULY 1, 2024, AND ANNUALLY THEREAF TER, EACH 11
158158 LOCAL LAW ENFORCEMEN T AGENCY SHALL PUBLI SH ON ITS PUBLIC WEB SITE THE 12
159159 AGGREGATE DATA OF PO LICE OFFICERS ’ USE OF FORCE REPORTE D UNDER 13
160160 SUBSECTION (A) OF THIS SECTION. 14
161161
162162 (2) ON OR BEFORE JANUARY 1, 2023, AND EVERY 3 MONTHS 15
163163 THEREAFTER , EACH LOCAL LAW ENFOR CEMENT AGENCY SHALL PUBLISH ON ITS 16
164164 PUBLIC WEBSITE THE T OTAL NUMBER OF USE O F FORCE INCIDENTS RE PORTED 17
165165 UNDER SUBSECTION (A) OF THIS SECTION FOR THE PRECEDING 3 MONTHS IN WHICH 18
166166 THE LOCAL LAW ENFORCEMENT AGENCY D ETERMINED THAT : 19
167167
168168 (I) THE USE OF FORCE WAS CONSISTENT WITH ITS POLICIES 20
169169 AND APPLICABLE LAWS ; AND 21
170170
171171 (II) THE USE OF FORCE WAS NOT CONSISTENT WITH ITS 22
172172 POLICIES AND APPLICA BLE LAWS. 23
173173
174174 [(1)] (3) On or before March 1 each year, each law enforcement agency 24
175175 shall submit to the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission the number of 25
176176 use of force complaints made against its police officers during the previous calendar year, 26
177177 aggregated by numbers of complaints administratively charged, not charged, unfounded, 27
178178 and exonerated. 28
179179
180180 [(2)] (4) On or before July 15 each year, the Maryland Police Training and 29
181181 Standards Commission shall post on its website and submit to the General Assembly, in 30
182182 accordance with § 2–1257 of the State Government Article, a compendium of the 31 SENATE BILL 752 5
183183
184184
185185 information submitted by law enforcement agencies under paragraph [(1)] (3) of this 1
186186 subsection. 2
187187
188188 [(3)] (5) If a law enforcement agency has not submitted the report 3
189189 required under paragraph [(1)] (3) of this subsection by July 1 for the previous calendar 4
190190 year, the Governor’s Office of Crime Prevention, Youth, and Victim Services may not make 5
191191 any grant funds available to that law enforcement agency. 6
192192
193193 SECTION 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That Section 1 of this Act shall take 7
194194 effect October 1, 2022. It shall remain effective until the taking effect of Section 2 of this 8
195195 Act. If Section 2 of this Act takes effect, Section 1 of this Act, with no further action required 9
196196 by the General Assembly, shall be abrogated and of no further force and effect. 10
197197
198198 SECTION 4. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That Section 2 of this Act shall take 11
199199 effect July 1, 2022 the effective date of Chapter 59 of the Acts of the General Assembly of 12
200200 2021. If the effective date of Chapter 59 is amended, Section 2 of this Act shall take effect 13
201201 on the taking effect of Chapter 59. 14
202202
203203 SECTION 5. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That, subject to the provisions of 15
204204 Sections 3 and 4 of this Act, this Act shall take effect July 1, 2022. 16
205205