Maryland 2022 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB765 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/09/2022

                             
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
          *sb0765*  
  
SENATE BILL 765 
E2, E4   	2lr2929 
SB 636/11 – JPR   	CF 2lr2979 
By: Senator Sydnor 
Introduced and read first time: February 7, 2022 
Assigned to: Judicial Proceedings 
 
A BILL ENTITLED 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Probation – Probation Work Readiness Pilot Program 2 
 
FOR the purpose of establishing the Probation Work Readiness Pilot Program to provide 3 
dedicated services for individuals placed on probation to obtain and retain 4 
employment; and generally relating to the Probation Work Readiness Pilot Program. 5 
 
BY adding to 6 
 Article – Courts and Judicial Proceedings 7 
Section 3–2301 and 3–2302 to be under the new subtitle “Subtitle 23. Probation Work 8 
Readiness Pilot Program” 9 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 10 
 (2020 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 11 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 12 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 13 
 
Article – Courts and Judicial Proceedings 14 
 
SUBTITLE 23. PROBATION WORK READINESS PILOT PROGRAM. 15 
 
3–2301. 16 
 
 THIS SUBTITLE APPLIES ONLY: 17 
 
 (1) IN A COUNTY IN WHICH THE DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY 18 
AND CORRECTIONAL SERVICES HAS ESTABLISHED A PROBATION WORK READINESS 19 
PILOT PROGRAM UNDER § 3–2302 OF THIS SUBTITLE ; AND 20 
 
 (2) TO THE EXTENT THAT FU NDS ARE PROVIDED IN AN ANNUAL 21 
STATE BUDGET FOR A PROBATION WORK READINESS PILOT PROGRAM. 22  2 	SENATE BILL 765  
 
 
 
3–2302. 1 
 
 (A) THE DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND CORRECTIONAL SERVICES 2 
SHALL ESTABLISH A PROBATION WORK READINESS PILOT PROGRAM IN AT LEAST 3 
TWO COUNTIES IN THE STATE. 4 
 
 (B) THE PURPOSE OF THE PROGRAM IS TO PROVIDE DEDICATED SERVICES 5 
FOR INDIVIDUALS PLAC ED ON PROBATION TO O BTAIN AND RETAIN EMPLOYMENT . 6 
 
 (C) THE PROGRAM SHALL : 7 
 
 (1) PROVIDE DEDICATED SER VICES FOR INDIVIDUAL S PLACED ON 8 
PROBATION TO OBTAIN AND RETAIN EMPLOYMEN T; 9 
 
 (2) SPECIALIZE IN THE EMP LOYMENT NEEDS OF IND IVIDUALS ON 10 
PROBATION; 11 
 
 (3) ACTIVELY RECRUIT EMPL OYERS WHO ARE REC EPTIVE TO 12 
EMPLOYING INDIVIDUAL S ON PROBATION ; 13 
 
 (4) PROVIDE JOB TRAINING TO PARTICIPANTS BASE D ON IDENTIFIED 14 
NEEDS; AND 15 
 
 (5) IMPLEMENT A DATA MANA	GEMENT SYSTEM TO PRO VIDE 16 
DETAILED INFORMATION ON THE OUTCOMES OF P ARTICIPANTS IN THE PROGRAM. 17 
 
 (D) THE DIVISION OF PAROLE AND PROBATION WITHIN THE DEPARTMENT 18 
OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND CORRECTIONAL SERVICES SHALL DEVELO P GUIDELINES 19 
FOR THE PROGRAM, INCLUDING: 20 
 
 (1) CRITERIA FOR THE SELE CTION OF PROVIDERS O F EMPLOYMENT 21 
SERVICES UNDER THE PROGRAM; 22 
 
 (2) CRITERIA FOR THE SELECTION OF PAR TICIPANTS IN THE 23 
PROGRAM; 24 
 
 (3) LIMITS ON THE MAXIMUM NUMBER OF PARTICIPANTS IN T HE 25 
PROGRAM; 26 
 
 (4) STIPENDS PAID TO PA RTICIPANTS IN THE PROGRAM, WHICH 27 
SHALL BE AT A MINIMU M EQUAL TO THE LIVIN G WAGE, AS DEFINED IN § 18–103 OF 28 
THE STATE FINANCE AND PROCUREMENT ARTICLE; AND 29   	SENATE BILL 765 	3 
 
 
 
 (5) PERFORMANCE GOALS FOR THE PROGRAM. 1 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That, on or before October 1, 2023, 2 
and October 1, 2024, the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services shall 3 
submit a report to the General Assembly, in accordance with § 2–1257 of the State 4 
Government Article, that evaluates the Probation Work Readiness Pilot Program 5 
established by this Act. 6 
 
 SECTION 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 7 
1, 2022. Section 1 of this Act shall remain effective for a period of 2 years and, at the end of 8 
June 30, 2024, Section 1 of this Act, with no further action required by the General 9 
Assembly, shall be abrogated and of no further force and effect. 10