House
|
03/18/2022
|
Hearing 3/29 at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Referred Health and Government Operations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Floor Amendment {343829/1 (Senator Carter) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Floor Amendment {913722/1 (Senator Eckardt) Withdrawn
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Motion Special Order until 3/3 (Senator Griffith) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Floor Amendment {913722/1 (Senator Eckardt)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Washington) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments {523624/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
Motion Special Order until 3/1 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments {523624/1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Motion Special Order until 2/25 (Senator Carter) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
Motion Laid Over (Senator Carter) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/30/2021
|
Pre-filed
|
|
|