House | 04/03/2022 | Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 04/03/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Referred Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {963027/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |