House | 03/29/2022 | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Third Reading Passed (42-0) | ||
Senate | 03/28/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/28/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {793729/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/25/2022 | Motion Special Order until 3/28 (Senator Smith) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/25/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {793729/1 | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Motion Laid Over (Senator Smith) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |