Senate | 05/29/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 536 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (95-36) | ||
House | 04/09/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/09/2022 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 04/09/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 04/09/2022 | Hearing 4/09 at 11:00 a.m. | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Referred Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {823628/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |