Senate
|
05/29/2022
|
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 512
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Passed Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Senate Concurs House Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Floor Committee Amendment {433822/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments {233129/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Hearing 3/29 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Hearing 3/29 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
Referred Health and Government Operations Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments {343926/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
First Reading Finance
|
|
|