House | 03/23/2022 | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |