Senate | 05/12/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 261 | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/06/2022 | Third Reading Passed (100-32) | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Referred Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |