House | 03/23/2022 | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Referred Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {773722/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |