Senate
|
05/29/2022
|
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 713
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Returned Passed
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (112-21)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
Favorable Report by Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
Hearing 3/29 at 3:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
Referred Appropriations Ways and Means
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments {723122/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Hearing 3/02 at 1:03 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Hearing canceled
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
|
|
|